Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Corrionero

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1554¹Born
6 Oct 161460.7AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
26 Apr 161561.3Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
17 May 162167.3AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
4 Apr 163379.2DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Corrionero
Bishop Antonio Corrionero (born 1554, died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBabilafuente

  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,964
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 132, and Page 300
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 131, Number 841
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 25
  • ob: CB, 10 Mar 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,335

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast