Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agustín Antolínez, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1554BornValladolid
10 May 162368.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
24 Aug 162368.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
1 Jul 162469.6AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
19 Jun 162671.5DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Agustín Antolínez:
Archbishop Agustín Antolínez O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,834
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 151, and Page 158
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 144, Number 917
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014