Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Ramírez de Arellano, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1529¹Born
12 May 160071.3AppointedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
25 Jul 160071.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
24 Mar 160980.2DiedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Ramírez de Arellano (VIAF: 238228019)
Bishop Juan Ramírez de Arellano O.P. (born 1529, died ) Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMurillo, Spain

  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,372
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,959
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 115, Number 727
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017