Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rutilio Benzoni

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1542¹Born
16 Dec 158644.9AppointedBishop of Loreto, Italy
28 Dec 158644.9Ordained BishopBishop of Loreto, Italy
9 Feb 159250.1AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
31 Jan 161371.0DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rutilio Benzoni (VIAF: 216689323)
Bishop Rutilio Benzoni (born 1542, died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 220
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 25, Number 116
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018