Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Emilio Cardinal Sfondrati

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1560BornMilan
19 Dec 159030.7Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jan 159130.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
3 Sep 160747.4AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
16 Sep 160747.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
19 Jul 161050.3ResignedBishop of Cremona, Italy
17 Aug 161151.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
14 Feb 161857.8DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Paolo Emilio Sfondrati
Paolo Emilio Cardinal Sfondrati (born , died ) Bishop of Cremona

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
  • a cardinal for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1590
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 167
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 36
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jul 2016