Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Serrano Ortiz, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Acerno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1573Born
20 Nov 161340.8AppointedBishop of Acerno, Italy
24 Nov 161340.8Ordained BishopBishop of Acerno, Italy
Mar 1637³64.1DiedBishop of Acerno, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Serrano Ortiz
Bishop Juan Serrano Ortiz O.F.M. Obs. (born , died Mar 1637) Bishop of Acerno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcázar de San Juan, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Giacomo dei Spagnuoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 66
  • bp/bd/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 130, Number 833
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1613, Number 31
  • b/c2+: CB, 13 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017