Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Torres de Osorio

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1562BornCuéllar
13 Nov 161351.8AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
24 Nov 161351.8Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
19 Oct 161957.7AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
22 Apr 162462.2SelectedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
29 May 162462.3ConfirmedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
7 Mar 162765.1SelectedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
19 Jul 162765.5ConfirmedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
23 Sep 163270.6DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Torres de Osorio:
Bishop Juan Torres de Osorio (born , died ) Bishop of Valladolid

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 325, and Page 141
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 268, and Page 357
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 55, Number 313
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 129, Number 827

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015