Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Bescapè, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1550Born
157827.1ProfessedPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
8 Feb 159342.2AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
24 Feb 159342.3Ordained BishopBishop of Novara, Italy
6 Oct 161564.9DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Bescapè (VIAF: 88612687)
Bishop Carlo Bescapè B. (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopS. Blaise de l'Anello, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 262
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 261
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 32, Number 154
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1593, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast