Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gian Antonio Paravicini

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Severina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1588Born
17 Dec 161123.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Como, Italy
22 Dec 161224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Como, Italy
23 Mar 165466.1AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
6 Apr 165466.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
17 Nov 165971.8DiedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gian Antonio Paravicini (VIAF: 89390032)
Archbishop Gian Antonio Paravicini (born , died ) Archbishop of Santa Severina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSondrio
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCatanzaro, Diocese of Catanzaro
Buried Place (Original)Church of the Rosary, Catanzaro, Diocese of Catanzaro

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 314
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 35
  • ob/c2: AT, 8 Nov 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018