Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Evangelista Cardinal Pallotta

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Feb 1548³Born
11 Sep 158739.6AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
13 Sep 158739.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
18 Dec 158739.8Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 158839.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
158940.9AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
5 Apr 159143.1ResignedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
16 Jun 160355.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
24 Jan 161162.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
6 Apr 162072.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
22 Aug 162072.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Evangelista Pallotta (VIAF: 316388881)
Giovanni Evangelista Cardinal Pallotta (born Feb 1548, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaldarola, Diocese of Camerino, Italy
Ordained BishopXII Apôtres, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Caterina, Caldarola, Diocese of Camerino, Italy

  • a bishop for 32.9 years
  • a cardinal for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1587
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 184
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 26, Number 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018