Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ladislao Cardinal d’Aquino

Deceased

Bishop of Venafro, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1543¹Born
1571²28.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Oct 158138.8AppointedBishop of Venafro, Italy
1608²65.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
15 Sep 161370.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
20 Sep 161370.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
19 Sep 161673.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Oct 161673.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
12 Feb 162178.1DiedBishop of Venafro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Ladislao d’Aquino (VIAF: 169440400)
Ladislao Cardinal d’Aquino (born 1543, died ) Bishop of Venafro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained PriestNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Tommaso Chapel, S. Maria sopra Minerva, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a cardinal for 4.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1616
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 328
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 252
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581, Number 19*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast