Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro (Fabrizio) Suardi

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹BornNapoli
28 Jan 161934.0AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
10 Feb 161934.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
9 Feb 163752.1AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
Apr 1638³53.2DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro (Fabrizio) Suardi:
Bishop Alessandro (Fabrizio) Suardi , Bishop of Caserta

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 225, and Page 138
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 65, Number 380
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Mar 2015