Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Filomarino, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caiazzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹BornNapoli
18 Sep 161755.7AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
24 Sep 161755.7Ordained BishopBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
27 May 162361.4DiedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Filomarino:
Bishop Paolo Filomarino C.R. (died ) Bishop of Caiazzo

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 127
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015