Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Girolamo de Franchis

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹Born
13 Nov 161736.8AppointedBishop of Nardò, Italy
26 Nov 161736.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nardò, Italy
27 Nov 163453.9AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
Jan 1635³54.0DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo de Franchis
Archbishop Girolamo de Franchis (born 1581, died Jan 1635) Archbishop of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 134, and Page 257
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 63, Number 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast