Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raphael Riva (Ripa), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹Born
12 Sep 160535.6AppointedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
14 Sep 160535.7Ordained BishopBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
24 Nov 161040.8AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
1611¹41.0DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raphael Riva (Ripa) (VIAF: 89363984)
Bishop Raphael Riva (Ripa) O.P. (born 1570, died 1611) Bishop of Chioggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 170, and Page 153
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,605, Number 47
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,652

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast