Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregor Helfenstein

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1559¹Born
29 Oct 159940.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
29 Oct 159940.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
1 Nov 159940.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
21 Oct 163273.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregor Helfenstein
Bishop Gregor Helfenstein (born 1559, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOberemmel, Archdiocese of Trier
Ordained BishopSant’Apollinare, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 106
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 24
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast