Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Schweikard von Kronberg

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1553Born
17 Feb 160450.5SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
2 Aug 160451.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
21 Nov 160451.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
17 Sep 162673.1DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Schweikard von Kronberg
Archbishop Johann Schweikard von Kronberg (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainz, Archdiocese of Mainz
Ordained BishopSt. Martin, Mainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 245
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,851
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,831

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 16 Aug 2020

Quantcast