Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius Gobelius

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1570Born
159625.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 160939.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
14 Dec 160939.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
20 Sep 1610³39.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
5 Jun 161140.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Gobelius
Bishop Cornelius Gobelius (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCochem

  • a priest for 15.4 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 96
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018