Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel Brendel von Homburg

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1522Born
18 Apr 155533.0SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
23 Aug 155533.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
6 Jun 155735.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
22 Mar 158260.0DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Daniel Brendel von Homburg (VIAF: 44660872)
Archbishop Daniel Brendel von Homburg (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAschaffenburg
Ordained BishopAschaffenburg

  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 232
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1557, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 4 Nov 2017