Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrosius Seibaeus (Seybeus)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹BornErfurt
159724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
22 May 162350.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
22 May 162350.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)
23 Jul 162350.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)
20 Nov 164471.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ambrosius Seibaeus (Seybeus):
Bishop Ambrosius Seibaeus (Seybeus) (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 251
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015