Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Weber

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Ascalon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560Born
8 Feb 161555.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
8 Feb 161555.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
4 Apr 161656.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
21 May 163373.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Christoph Weber
Bishop Christoph Weber (born 1560, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeligenstadt
Ordained BishopMainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,884
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 96
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1616, Number 8
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,872

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 16 Aug 2020

Quantcast