Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lothar von Metternich

Deceased

Archbishop of Trier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1551BornVettelkoven
1574²22.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trier, Germany
13 Jun 159947.7Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
7 Aug 159947.9SelectedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
13 Oct 159948.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
30 Jul 160048.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trier, Germany
7 Sep 162372.0DiedArchbishop of Trier, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lothar von Metternich:
Archbishop Lothar von Metternich (born , died ) Archbishop of Trier

  • a priest for 24.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 343

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 4 Feb 2015