Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Coriolano Garzadori

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ossero (Osor), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1543¹Born
19 Jan 157532.0AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
Dec 1594³51.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
1 Sep 160663.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
1614²71.0ResignedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
26 Mar 161875.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Ossero (Osor), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Coriolano Garzadori
Bishop Coriolano Garzadori (born 1543, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ossero (Osor)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicenza, Diocese of Vicenza, Italy
Death PlaceVicenza, Diocese of Vicenza, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 92
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 267
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1575, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Treccani.it, 9 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018