Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Camillo Borghese

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Sep 1594AppointedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
8 Sep 1594Ordained BishopBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
7 Jan 1600AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
24 Jan 1607AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
8 Oct 1612DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Borghese
Archbishop Camillo Borghese (died ) Archbishop of Siena

EventPlace
Ordained BishopMoniales Ste Marthe, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 208, and Page 139
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 312
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 158
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1594, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast