Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Velarde de la Cuenca

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Dec 1578Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 1599AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
14 Feb 1599Ordained BishopArchbishop of Messina, Italy
8 Jul 1604DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francisco Velarde de la Cuenca
Archbishop Francisco Velarde de la Cuenca (died ) Archbishop of Messina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurgos, Diocese of Burgos, Spain
Ordained BishopS.Andre du Quirinal, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 239
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 35, Number 177
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 112, Number 710
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 242
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018