Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Istvan Szentandrássy (Cecchio), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Smederevo (Semendria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1571¹BornCsikmadéfalva
1593¹22.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
6 Nov 160635.8AppointedBishop of Smederevo (Semendria), Serbia
30 Nov 160635.9Ordained BishopBishop of Smederevo (Semendria), Serbia
162453.0ResignedBishop of Smederevo (Semendria), Serbia
21 Sep 163059.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Smederevo (Semendria), Serbia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁵ Doubtful

MicroData Summary for Istvan Szentandrássy (Cecchio):
Bishop Istvan Szentandrássy (Cecchio) O.F.M. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Smederevo (Semendria)

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 303
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 297
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,350
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013