Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo Florio, O. Cruc. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹BornVenice
7 Jun 162134.4AppointedBishop of Canea (Cydonia, Egée), Greece
13 Jun 162134.4Ordained BishopBishop of Canea (Cydonia, Egée), Greece
28 Apr 164255.3AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
14 Feb 165669.1DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Florio:
Archbishop Bernardo Florio O. Cruc. (died ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 207, and Page 72
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 72, Number 421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013