Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Ciera, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575²BornVenice
13 Jan 164267.0AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
9 Feb 164267.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vieste, Italy
23 May 164267.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
27 May 164469.4ResignedBishop of Vieste, Italy
21 Mar 164772.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Ciera:
Bishop Paolo Ciera O.S.A. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri)

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 366
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 106, Number 645

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014