Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marino Badoer, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pula (Pola)


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jan 1634Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Jul 1641AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
7 Jul 1641Ordained BishopBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
1648¹DiedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marino Badoer:
Bishop Marino Badoer O.S.B. , Bishop of Pula (Pola)

  • a priest for 13.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 283
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1641, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Mar 2015