Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Diotallevi

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1579¹BornRimini
21 Jul 161435.5AppointedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
10 Aug 161435.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Aug 161435.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Aug 161435.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
31 Aug 161435.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
8 Jul 162142.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
May 1622²43.3DiedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Diotallevi (VIAF: 161173968)
Bishop Francesco Diotallevi (born 1579, died May 1622) Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia

  • a priest for 7.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 84
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 56, Number 321
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 14
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Oct 2016