Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gregorio Cardinal Petrocchini, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Feb 1536³BornMontelparo, Italy
20 Dec 158953.9Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 159054.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
28 May 160872.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
24 Jan 161175.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
17 Aug 161175.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
2 Oct 161175.7Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
19 May 161276.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Petrocchini:
Gregorio Cardinal Petrocchini O.S.A. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a bishop for .6 years
  • a cardinal for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1589
  • bd/ob/c2+: CB, 18 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014