Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Giustiniani, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Isola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1572Born
24 Nov 161441.9AppointedBishop of Isola, Italy
30 Nov 161441.9Ordained BishopBishop of Isola, Italy
27 Nov 161744.9DiedBishop of Isola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Giustiniani
Bishop Andrea Giustiniani O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Isola

  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 209
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 57, Number 323
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018