Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Girolamo Pignatelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566¹BornNapoli
18 May 161549.3AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
28 May 161549.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
22 Dec 161852.9DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Pignatelli:
Archbishop Girolamo Pignatelli C.R. (born 1566, died ) Archbishop of Rossano

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 297
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 58, Number 331
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015