Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ascanio Gesualdo

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Jul 1613AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
24 Oct 1615AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
17 Jun 1617AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
25 Jun 1618AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
17 Apr 1621ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
27 Jan 1638DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Gesualdo (VIAF: 27445231)
Patriarch Ascanio Gesualdo (died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 110, and Page 162
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1613, Number 26
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Oct 2016