Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni (Diego) Lopez de Andrade, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Otranto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569²Born Azambuja, Portugal
20 Nov 162354.8AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
30 Nov 162354.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
22 Aug 162859.6DiedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni (Diego) Lopez de Andrade:
Archbishop Giovanni (Diego) Lopez de Andrade O.S.A. (died ) Archbishop of Otranto

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 205
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 81, Number 482
  • bp/bd/d: CB, 25 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015