Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Niceforo Melisseno Comneno

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

Note/Previous Titular See: (from arch/Naxos et Paros)


Events

DateEventTitle
1607¹Ordained BishopBishop
13 Dec 1626SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
29 May 1628ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
5 Feb 1635³DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niceforo Melisseno Comneno:
Archbishop Niceforo Melisseno Comneno (died ) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

  • a bishop for 28.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 166, and Page 253
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,930

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014