Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Felice Cardinal Centini, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562BornAscoli Piceno
17 Aug 161149.6Elevated to Cardinal
31 Aug 161149.7AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
2 Oct 161149.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
12 Sep 161250.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
12 Aug 161351.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
23 Sep 161351.7AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
3 Mar 162159.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
28 Nov 163371.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
24 Jan 164179.1DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Centini:
Cardinal Felice Centini O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

  • a bishop for 29.3 years
  • a cardinal for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Aug 1611
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 12, and Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013