Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Antonio Angrisani, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jun 1612AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
11 Jun 1612Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
29 Aug 1641DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Angrisani:
Archbishop Giovanni Antonio Angrisani C.R. (died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 324
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 52, Number 290
  • b/c2+: CB, 21 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015