Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Merino, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹BornBaeza, Spain
20 Nov 162353.8AppointedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
26 Nov 162353.9Ordained BishopBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
24 Aug 162656.6AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
1 Jan 163767.0DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Merino:
Bishop Diego Merino O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Isernia

  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 247, and Page 211
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 81, Number 479
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 144, Number 918
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 23 Feb 2015