Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Ripoz, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1553¹BornBarcelona
12 Nov 161865.9AppointedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
25 Nov 161865.9Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
17 Dec 162068.0DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rafael Ripoz:
Bishop Rafael Ripoz O.P. (died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 181
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 65, Number 377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013