Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego (Didaco) Alvarez, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555¹Born
19 Mar 160752.2AppointedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
1 Apr 160752.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trani, Italy
10 May 163277.3DiedArchbishop of Trani, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego (Didaco) Alvarez (VIAF: 937248)
Archbishop Diego (Didaco) Alvarez O.P. (born 1555, died ) Archbishop of Trani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedina de Rioseco, Diocese of Palencia, Spain
Ordained BishopSanta Maria sopra Minerva, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceTrani, Archdiocese of Trani
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Trani, Archdiocese of Trani

  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 341
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 123, Number 784
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 31
  • b/c2: AT, 1 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018