Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alvaro Mendoza, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Nov 1622AppointedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
20 Nov 1622Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
29 May 1628AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
1631²DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alvaro Mendoza
Bishop Alvaro Mendoza O.F.M. (died 1631) Bishop of Jaca

  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 90, and Page 205
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 78, Number 458
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 142, Number 903
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast