Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ottavio Cardinal Ridolfi

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1582³BornRome
14 Aug 161230.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 161230.5AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
21 Oct 161230.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
5 Sep 162240.4Elevated to Cardinal
26 Oct 162240.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone
20 Mar 162340.9AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
7 Oct 162341.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
6 Jul 162442.2DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Ridolfi:
Ottavio Cardinal Ridolfi (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a priest for 11.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
  • a cardinal for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Sep 1622
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 94, and Page 73
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 53, Number 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 18 Feb 2015