Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Moro

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Dec 1612AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
8 Dec 1612Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
2 Mar 1626AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
10 May 1630³DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo Moro:
Bishop Camillo Moro (died ) Bishop of Comacchio

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 334, and Page 157
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 54, Number 302

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013