Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Giacomo Macedonio

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1563¹Born
17 Mar 160845.2AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
23 Mar 160845.2Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
27 Sep 162764.7DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giacomo Macedonio
Bishop Giovanni Giacomo Macedonio (born 1563, died ) Bishop of Monopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSant'Agnese in Piazza Navona, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Monopoli, Diocese of Monopoli

  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1608, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 246
  • ob/c2/d: AT, 6 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017