Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Antonio Grimani

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Oct 1587AppointedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
15 Nov 1587Ordained BishopBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
11 Jul 1605AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
27 Jun 1616ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
22 May 1618AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy
Sep 1618³ResignedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
22 Dec 1622SucceededPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
26 Jan 1628DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Grimani
Patriarch Antonio Grimani (died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 90, and Page 340
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 315
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 27, Number 126
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast