Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Priuli

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1537²Born
Sep 1590³53.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 159154.0AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
25 Jan 159154.0Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
27 Jan 159154.0InstalledPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
5 Jun 159659.4Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 159659.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
26 Jan 160063.0DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Priuli (VIAF: 70644303)
Lorenzo Cardinal Priuli (born 1537, died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 9.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
  • a cardinal for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596
  • ob/c2: AT, 25 May 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Jul 2017