Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando (Pietro) D’Avila, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Mar 1592AppointedBishop of Rethymo, Greece
28 Apr 1592Ordained BishopBishop of Rethymo, Greece
9 Mar 1594AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy
1620¹DiedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando (Pietro) D’Avila (VIAF: 261982121)
Bishop Ferdinando (Pietro) D’Avila O.F.M. Obs. (died 1620) Bishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRedentore, Basilica, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceAscoli Satriano, Diocese of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Ascoli Satriano, Diocese of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia)

  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 295, and Page 96
  • ob/c23: AT, 23 May 2017
  • c4: CB, 23 May 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,378
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1592, Number 10
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1592, Number 3*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast