Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcello Acquaviva

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Otranto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1531BornNapoli
25 Feb 158756.1AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
8 Jan 159059.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
22 Dec 159160.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
13 Sep 159261.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
1 Apr 159564.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
160675.0ResignedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
18 Mar 161786.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Otranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcello Acquaviva
Archbishop Marcello Acquaviva (born 1531, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Otranto

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 212
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 Sep 2016