Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedetto Ala

Deceased

Archbishop of Urbino


Events

DateEventTitle
5 May 1610AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
9 May 1610Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
27 Apr 1620DiedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Ala:
Archbishop Benedetto Ala (died ) Archbishop of Urbino

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 353
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 48, Number 263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013